FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW'S CHURCH, WALBERSWICK

Charity number: 1202628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Making grants for the preservation of St Andrews Church, Walberswick and its adjoining ruins and churchyard

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £11,739
Total expenditure: £2,184

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 April 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gordon Frank Beard Chair 09 January 2023
None on record
Edward John Warbey Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
NATHANIEL BERNARD LE ROUX Trustee 09 January 2023
THE LE ROUX TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.74k
Total expenditure £2.18k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HOMELAND
THE STREET
WALBERSWICK
SOUTHWOLD
IP18 6UN
Phone:
01502724143
Website:

No information available