NURTURE VILLAGE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We currently provide support for families of children from pregnancy to five years by running inclusive outreach groups with feeding support in Cleethorpes, which are accessible to people in North East Lincolnshire and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 05 June 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Guy | Chair | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Prentice | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
April Smith | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Doyle | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Simpson | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116 | |
|
Total expenditure | £90 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PARENTS TO BE AND PARENTS OF INFANTS, TODDLERS AND YOUNG CHILDREN IN NEED OF SUPPORT IN NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE BY THE PROVISION OF ACCESSIBLE ANTENATAL AND POSTNATAL EDUCATION COURSES, WORKSHOPS AND OUTREACH GROUPS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kings Baptist Church
Alexandra Road
CLEETHORPES
DN35 8LG
- Phone:
- 07300911539
- Email:
- nurturevillagenel@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window