COSBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Village Hall is used for dance, Karate, art, quilting and Tai Chi classes. There are recreational groups from Craft for children to Kurling. The Hall, situated on the Village Park, has shower and changing rooms used by the village cricket, rugby and adult and junior football teams. During the year the Hall has been used by for wedding, birthday, anniversary and children's parties
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £300 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 25 July 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN GRAHAM ANDERSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Vincent Munton | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Whitby | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Howkins | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Munton | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
COLIN BILLS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.77k | £16.35k | £35.13k | £38.62k | £38.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.66k | £18.59k | £17.83k | £29.11k | £35.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £300 | £300 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.38k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 September 2024 | 225 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 July 2022 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 July 2022 | 540 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 July 2022 | 540 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 21 FEBRUARY, 1974
Charitable objects
PROPERTY HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF COSBY IN THE COUNTY OF LEICESTER WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF COSBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 LINLEY GREEN
COSBY
LEICESTER
LE9 1UT
- Phone:
- 01162865694
- Email:
- cosbyvillagehall@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window