PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 521417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of a play area, sports picthes, skate park, basketball court and recreation ground for the benefit of the residents of the Parish of Fleckney on land situated off Leicester Road, Fleckney, Leicestershire.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,155
Total expenditure: £18,622

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FLECKNEY PARISH COUNCIL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FLECKNEY PARISH COUNCIL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £4.05k £0 £0 £3.16k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £18.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 April 2024 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 March 2022 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PO BOX 8092
FLECKNEY
LEICESTER
LE8 8WW
Phone:
01162404589