Financial history HINCKLEY UNIT 401 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 521428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £28.74k £33.28k £56.02k £27.01k £24.99k
Total expenditure £25.05k £24.50k £59.50k £18.36k £18.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k