Financial history VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.17k £3.31k £2.75k £7.40k £1.72k
Total expenditure £2.69k £3.57k £3.92k £3.37k £5.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A