CYLCH MEITHRIN I D HOOSON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cylch Meithrin ID Hooson is Welsh language pre-school nursery and nursery setting that is registered with CIW and Mudiad Meithrin. It incorporates a pre-school nursery, early entitlement education, Nursery Plus and Flying Start. They provide early education in the village of Rhosllannerchrugog and it's surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,597 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Wrexham
Governance
- 15 February 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hywel Dodd | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rhodri Roger Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dyfan Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
GWYN JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL AND PRIMARY AGED CHILDREN (WITH PARTICULAR FOCUS ON PRE-SCHOOL AGED CHILDREN) THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF WELSH LANGUAGE WITHIN THE AREA OF RHOSLLANERCHRUGOG, NEAR WREXHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cylch Meithrin I D Hooson
YSGOL I D HOOSON
HEOL CARADOC
RHOSLLANERCHRUGOG
WRECSAM
- Phone:
- 01978832950
- Email:
- cylchidhooson@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window