MOIRA MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 521471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £35.10k £33.71k £39.01k £42.87k £48.42k
Total expenditure £34.05k £32.05k £44.41k £41.37k £43.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A