THE ACTORS' WORKSHOP BRISTOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Actors Workshop Bristol offers cutting edge actor training for adults and teens, getting 80 to 90n percent of students into UK drama conservatoires every year. We offer CPD for actors, teachers and the community through workshops, short courses and performances. Scholarships and bursaries allow anyone with the necessary talent and drive to access our training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 January 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRYN HOLDING | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ODEKE | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CHARLES LOACH | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Fisher | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY YOUNG PEOPLE, IN THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE PERFORMING ARTS (INCLUDING, DRAMA, SINGING AND DANCE AND THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF SPEECH TRAINING) IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF COURSES, TUITION, WORKSHOPS, CLASSES, REHEARSALS, PERFORMANCES AND BY SUPPORTING THEM FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 2. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE PERFORMING ARTS, INCLUDING DRAMA, MUSIC, DANCE AND SINGING BY THE PRODUCTION OF PLAYS, AND BY TEACHING AND TRAINING ARTISTS TO ENABLE THEM TO PRODUCE WORKS OF A HIGH STANDARD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 ROSEMOUNT ROAD
FLAX BOURTON
BRISTOL
BS48 1UQ
- Phone:
- +447970748640
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window