Trustees BLACKPOOL DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 521534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Michael Hardy Chair 26 January 2023
Gerry Richardson Trust
Received: On time
Peter Rumley Trustee 06 July 2023
1ST NORBRECK SCOUT GROUP
Overdue by 79 days
David Edward Cooper Trustee 06 July 2023
None on record
Victoria Kenmare Trustee 06 July 2023
None on record
Andrew David Inglis Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Emma Jayne Harrison Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Robert John Ward Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Lesley Meddings Trustee 29 September 2022
1ST BISPHAM SCOUT GROUP
Overdue by 79 days
JOAN SWAN Trustee 07 July 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. CHAD, POULTON-LE-FYLDE.
Received: On time
Matthew Philip Hornby Trustee 07 July 2022
None on record
Liam Chow Trustee 17 July 2021
None on record
Gabrielle Howson-Tax Trustee 01 September 2020
WEST LANCASHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Janet Hardy Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
Joanna Hacking Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
Elizabeth Abbott Trustee 01 January 2016
1ST BISPHAM SCOUT GROUP
Overdue by 79 days