THE WINIFRED AND ISIDORE WARTSKI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Income to be paid to named educational charities and organisations for grants and scholarships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 May 2023: Standard registration
- ISIDORE WARTSKI DECEASED WILL TRUST (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Martin | Trustee | 13 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 13 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF ANY EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION OR COLLEGE OR SCHOOL OR ASSOCIATION WHICH INCLUDES RELIGIOUS OR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES WITHIN ITS SCOPE AS MORE PARTICULARLY SET OUT IN CLAUSE 9 OF THE WILL OF ISIDORE WARTSKI.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HSBC TRUST SERVICES
1ST FLOOR, FORUM 1 THE FORUM
PARKWAY
WHITELEY
HAMPSHIRE
PO15 7PA
- Phone:
- 02380722237
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window