Accounts and annual returns 17th Barrow (St Perran's) Scout Group

Charity number: 521555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 10 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 03 May 2018 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required