Accounts and annual returns 35TH LANCASTER (ST JOSEPH'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 May 2020 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required