Financial history 17TH LYTHAM ST ANNE'S SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.79k £13.88k £15.65k £12.44k £2.75k
Total expenditure £11.16k £10.53k £10.54k £10.43k £14.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A