21ST ST HELENS (NEWTON-LE-WILLOWS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 25 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 23 July 2017 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required