21ST ST HELENS (NEWTON-LE-WILLOWS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £11.29k £13.16k £14.22k £11.17k £19.10k
Total expenditure £11.55k £22.10k £11.19k £9.63k £7.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k