ALL SAINTS KENTON FRIENDS (ASKFRIENDS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All Saints Kenton Friends (ASK Friends) supports the conservation, maintenance, and improvement of the fabric and fittings of All Saints Church. One of our sources of funding will be through grant applications. However, money is also raised through various fundraising activities (eg quizzes, art talks, concerts within the church) and we will welcome donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 30 May 2023: CIO registration
- ALL SAINTS KENTON FRIENDS (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Perkins | Chair | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David William Guthrie | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Julia Caroline Cox | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stawart Rand | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE GRADE 1 LISTED ALL SAINTS CHURCH, KENTON, DEVON FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO MAINTAINING, PRESERVING AND IMPROVING THE HISTORIC CHURCH BUILDING, ITS CHURCHYARD AND ITS CONTENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 St. Annes
Kenton
EXETER
EX6 8LJ
- Phone:
- 01626891835
- Website:
-
askfriends.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window