Accounts and annual returns 1ST RAINHILL COMPANY OF GIRL GUIDES

Charity number: 521656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required