Financial history 1ST RAINHILL COMPANY OF GIRL GUIDES

Charity number: 521656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £15.45k £24.15k £23.95k £22.50k £8.12k
Total expenditure £13.07k £21.45k £31.21k £14.79k £12.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A