3RD ROYTON (ST ANNE'S) BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/05/2016 30/05/2017 30/05/2018 30/05/2019 30/05/2020
Total gross income £8.80k £6.67k £5.28k £3.34k £3.80k
Total expenditure £12.67k £4.49k £4.91k £4.36k £4.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A