Financial history 1ST WHISTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521669
Charity reporting is up to date (227 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.28k £3.96k £10.13k £20.51k £14.01k
Total expenditure £5.54k £3.68k £8.82k £19.27k £13.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A