25TH STRETFORD (FIRSWOOD) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Each week, we give young people in Firswood the opportunity to enjoy fun and adventure while developing the skills they need to succeed, now and in the future: skills like teamwork, leadership, resilience and empathy. We believe in preparing young people with skills for life, encouraging our young people to do more, learn more and be more.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Trafford
Governance
- 25 November 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Smith | Chair | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Barnaby Gerard Franks | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark James Gilmore | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Craig | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Fordham | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.97k | £29.79k | £22.87k | £11.48k | £19.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.37k | £6.64k | £11.67k | £11.45k | £12.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.85k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 15TH FEBRUARY 1968 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST CORPORATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
SCOUT GROUP (UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
STRETFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Sylvan Avenue
MANCHESTER
M16 8AN
- Phone:
- 07931586751
- Email:
- gsl@firswoodscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window