2ND WALTON-LE-DALE SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 521695
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

scouting

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £24,684
Total expenditure: £20,641

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 July 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chris Hudson Trustee 27 July 2020
None on record
Paul Middleton Trustee 21 July 2017
None on record
Colin Harkness Trustee 21 July 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £14.40k £6.21k £5.00k £15.44k £24.68k
Total expenditure £12.30k £7.13k £6.71k £12.93k £20.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 09 February 2025 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 07 May 2024 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 15 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 09 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Balmoral Road
Walton-Le-Dale
PRESTON
PR5 4GN
Phone:
07757804878
Website:

No information available