Accounts and annual returns WIGAN DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 521705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window