Financial history ASHBY AND COALVILLE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 521717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £245.59k £92.83k £80.00k £92.65k £20.74k
Total expenditure £211.53k £135.34k £127.82k £133.91k £45.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £12.00k