Accounts and annual returns 1st Moira and Blackfordby Scouts

Charity number: 521719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 29 December 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 28 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 06 January 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 06 January 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required