Accounts and annual returns 4TH COALVILLE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 07 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 25 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 17 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 17 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 26 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 31 December 2018 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required