Financial history 4TH COALVILLE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £7.56k £14.50k £25.55k £9.77k £22.88k
Total expenditure £6.63k £10.18k £32.48k £9.86k £19.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.00k