THE WILTSHIRE GUILD OF SPINNERS WEAVERS AND DYERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No change
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 June 2023: CIO registration
- 18 October 2023: Funds received from 1168349 THE WILTSHIRE GUILD OF SPINNERS WEAVERS AND DYERS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERYL FRANCIS | Chair | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Zenobia Laverick | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Una Carlow | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Dimbylow | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE CRAFTSMANSHIP IN HAND WEAVING, SPINNING AND DYEING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN SUCH CRAFTSMANSHIP. IN PARTICULAR TO: PROVIDE A HAPPY AND FRIENDLY ATMOSPHERE IN WHICH TO LEARN, DEVELOP AND PRACTICE THE SKILLS OF WEAVING, SPINNING AND DYEING. EXPAND PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE HISTORY AND PRACTICE OF THESE CRAFTS BY DEMONSTRATIONS AT FESTIVALS AND OTHER EVENTS, SUPPORT LEARNING IN THE COMMUNITY BY ENCOURAGING MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO TAKE UP THE CRAFTS OF WEAVING, SPINNING AND DYEING AND OR A STUDY OF THEIR HERITAGE, AND TO ASSIST THEM IN THIS PROCESS. ENCOURAGE YOUNG PEOPLE TO LEARN AND PRACTICE THESE CRAFTS BOTH BY THEIR PARTICIPATION AT APPROPRIATE GUILD EVENTS AND ALSO BY PARTNERSHIP WORKING WITH EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 ST. MARYS SCHOOL BUILDINGS
HIGH STREET
STEEPLE ASHTON
TROWBRIDGE
BA14 6EU
- Phone:
- 0000000000
- Email:
- secretarywiltsswd@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.