Trustees 109TH (COUNTESTHORPE) ST ANDREWS SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 521759

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Samantha Topley | Chair | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Michael Hill | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Riley | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Christopher Topley | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clara Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Freeman | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Henson | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ross Lyon | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Richard Barber | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tim Mitchell | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jack Callum Barber | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.