Trustees Harborough District Scout Council
Charity number: 521764

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Catt | Chair | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Dove | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Alistair Helm | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Calum Facer | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Ruth Tallis | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
PHILIP REED | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Philip Humphrey | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Toby Philip James Taylor | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
MR D M MUGRIDGE | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|||||||
Debbie Billington | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|||||||
Suzanne Gardner | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Mary Cockbill | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||
JEAN WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
EDDIE HARMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN RICHARD LACEY | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ERIC STANLEY GAMBLE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.