Accounts and annual returns 1ST DONISTHORPE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 27 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 16 March 2022 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 03 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required