THE CAMERON DAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CDCT provides support to University students of Graphic Design (BA or MA), across the East Midlands {De Montfort University, Loughborough University, Nottingham Trent University, University of Derby, University of Lincoln, University of Northampton}.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 29 June 2023: Standard registration
- THE CDCT (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Day | Chair | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Kye Millard | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Davis | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rhona Breeze-Lawlor | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Day | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Shaw | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hollie Kemp | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Shaw | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tim Nye | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Bradley | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 JUN 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF UNIVERSITY STUDENTS, STUDYING GRAPHIC DESIGN IN THE EAST MIDLANDS BY: A) PROVIDING GRANTS FOR EQUIPMENT OR RESOURCES, ADDITIONAL TRAINING, MENTORING OR SUPPORT AND EXPENSES RELATED TO PREPARING FOR ENTRY INTO ANY GRAPHIC DESIGN OCCUPATION OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING AN EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT B) FACILITATING AN ANNUAL STUDENT COMPETITION TO ENCOURAGE EXCELLENCE AND ACHIEVEMENT IN GRAPHIC DESIGN
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 CHURCH STREET
KIRTON LINDSEY
GAINSBOROUGH
DN21 4BT
- Phone:
- 07852764459
- Email:
- tracey@cdct.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window