Accounts and annual returns HOLBEACH AND DISTRICT YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 521796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required