NORTH SCARLE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
sports and leisure
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 17 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLLEN VICKERS | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE Andrew CORAM | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tony Cass | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Howard | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.18k | £40.69k | £10.30k | £16.39k | £13.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.36k | £9.05k | £10.05k | £20.02k | £17.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £36.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 22 APRIL 1963
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH SCARLE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NORTH SCARLE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Scarle Village Hall
South Scarle Lane
North Scarle
LINCOLN
LN6 9ER
- Phone:
- 07591342312
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window