Trustees RAUCEBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIMON EUSTACE BLAND Chair
None on record
Rachel Redgrave Trustee 20 July 2022
None on record
David Price Trustee 20 July 2022
None on record
Alan John Harrison Trustee 15 July 2019
SLEAFORD CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Elizabeth Hewitt Trustee 04 April 2018
None on record
Bridget Anne Balderston Trustee 11 February 2014
None on record
COLIN PEARSON Trustee 26 April 2012
None on record
NICOLA TRACEY BELLAMY Trustee
None on record