BARNETBY LE WOLD RECREATIONAL FIELD

Charity number: 521892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 February 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 March 2020 39 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 February 2017 12 days late Download