BARNETBY LE WOLD RECREATIONAL FIELD

Charity number: 521892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £28.22k £140.88k £88.25k £42.79k £5.05k
Total expenditure £41.19k £149.24k £76.62k £60.67k £5.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £28.00k £100.00k £25.00k £30.00k N/A