THE DRUG OF ART

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to introduce art to young people to provide an alternative form of mental health support and well-being. Through in person workshops with artists, online and digital workshops and exhibitions we offer young people the chance to get creative. Our in person events operate in the South East area but our online content can be accessed anywhere in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Deverell | Chair |
|
||||||
Victoria Holden | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Lapper MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Emma Rutherford | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gary Mansfield | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, YOUNG PEOPLE, PRIMARILY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN WORKSHOPS AND EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AS A MEANS OF IMPROVING MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cedar Cottage
Church Lane
Kingston
LEWES
BN7 3LW
- Phone:
- 07790903213
- Email:
- alison@thedrugof.art
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.