OPEN ACCESS BOOK COLLECTIVE

Charity number: 1206287
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Bringing together open access publishers, publishing service providers, librarians, and other supporters to collectively bring about a fairer, more sustainable model of open book publishing, to increase the volume and diversity of academic knowledge available for free, to anyone.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Australia
  • Austria
  • Belgium
  • Brazil
  • Canada
  • Cyprus
  • Denmark
  • Finland
  • France
  • Germany
  • Ireland
  • Italy
  • Mexico
  • Netherlands
  • New Zealand
  • Nigeria
  • Northern Ireland
  • Norway
  • Portugal
  • Scotland
  • South Africa
  • Spain
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • United States
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 December 2023: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • OPEN BOOK COLLECTIVE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Joseph Edward Deville Chair 19 May 2022
None on record
Holly Gemma Limbert Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
DR DEMMY RONALD VERBEKE Trustee 08 September 2023
None on record
DR JOHN RUPERT JAMES GATTI Trustee 08 September 2023
None on record
NIELS SAABY STERN Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
Dr Reggie Raju Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
AMANDA DE SOUZA RAMALHO Trustee 08 September 2022
None on record
Dr Lidia Uziel PhD., MLIS Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
BDB PITMANS LLP
One Bartholomew Close
London
EC1A 7BL
Phone:
020 8191 2026