THE PENGUIN SPORTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1206051
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Penguin Sports Foundation provides therapeutic activity in the form of aquatic physiotherapy and accessible sport for children with physical disabilities in North Devon and beyond. We currently provide hydrotherapy 1:1 sessions, a frame running club & a Hydrotherapy after school group session.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall
  • Devon
  • Dorset
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 December 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • TPSF (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Brenda Leonard Chair 01 September 2022
None on record
Fiona Eckford Trustee 23 June 2023
None on record
Gary Palmar Trustee 04 May 2023
None on record
Claire Painting Trustee 13 April 2023
None on record
Fenella Johnson Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
Simpkin Edwards
Millennium House,
Roundswell Business Park
Brannam Crescent
Barnstable
EX31 3TD
Phone:
07591646331