Accounts and annual returns NORTH SOMERCOTES PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 521970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 September 2021 05 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 27 September 2020 05 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 27 September 2019 07 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 27 September 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 27 September 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 September 2017 Not Required