Financial history NORTH SOMERCOTES PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 521970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/09/2017 27/09/2018 27/09/2019 27/09/2020 27/09/2021
Total gross income £19.06k £14.36k £19.23k £5.33k £19.75k
Total expenditure £13.38k £16.75k £22.30k £5.03k £3.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £18.03k