Trustees ASHINGTON JOINT WELFARE SCHEME

Charity number: 522026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maureen Taylor Trustee 29 June 2023
AMARE HOSPICE AT HOME
Recently registered
Wendy Taylor Trustee 29 June 2022
None on record
JOHN CHARLES WIGGETT Trustee 17 May 2019
LYNEMOUTH BRANCH NUM PROVIDENT AND BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
STOBSWOOD MINERS' WELFARE RECREATION CENTRE
Received: On time
Gary Stephen Bell Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Gail Ballance Trustee 23 March 2016
FULL CIRCLE FOOD PROJECT
Overdue by 25 days
AMARE HOSPICE AT HOME
Recently registered
MARK FITTON Trustee 10 October 2011
NORTHUMBERLAND AGED MINEWORKERS' HOMES ASSOCIATION
Received: 34 days late
KEITH TREBILLCOCK Trustee
None on record
ROBERT WALKINSHAW Trustee
None on record
IAN LAVERY Trustee
NORTH EAST AREA MINERS' SOCIAL WELFARE TRUST FUND
Received: On time