Financial history ASHINGTON UNIT 12 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 522028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £16.10k £15.00k £19.92k £16.31k £5.77k
Total expenditure £20.96k £15.83k £9.68k £8.23k £12.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A