STAKEFORD AND BOMARSUND MINER'S WELFARE SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating throughout the Choppington Parish, the Welfare provides sporting, social and community facilities. With three pitches and a multi user games area, the Welfare acts as a sporting hub for the wider community and provides expert coaching for cricket, football & bowls. Open on a daily basis and run entirely by volunteers we provide a home for many local voluntary organisations and clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,707 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northumberland
Governance
- 04 August 1964: Standard registration
- STAKEFORD AND BOMARSUND SPORTS AND SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS JULIE FOSTER | Chair | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DUNN | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Huntley | Trustee | 28 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Robert Monaghan | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR ROWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS L MOFFATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN MACDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.99k | £55.39k | £60.22k | £56.56k | £55.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.03k | £44.58k | £43.22k | £68.46k | £68.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.91k | £9.71k | £9.71k | N/A | £12.71k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.25k | £31.09k | £11.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 1 JULY 1924, LEASE DATED 21 APRIL 1926, LEASE DATED 14 NOVEMBER 1963, SCHEME OF 15 JUNE 1965 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 1ST APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
A) READING ROOMS, BILLIARD ROOMS, AND FOR PUBLIC MEETINGS, DANCES OR OTHER SOCIAL ENTERTAINMENTS FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF PERSONS FOR THE TIME BEING RESIDING IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA. B) A RECREATION GROUND OR PLEASURE GROUND IN CONNECTION WITH THE ADJOINING MEMORIAL HALL OR INSTITUTE FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA. C) A SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE FOR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION (INCLUDING PHYSICAL EXERCISE) OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE LOCAL MINING COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF BEDLINGTONSHIRE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
East View
Stakeford
Choppington
NE62 5UD
- Phone:
- 01670815343
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window