Accounts and annual returns CRAMLINGTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 522051
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 February 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 August 2020 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 August 2019 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required