Financial history CRAMLINGTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 522051
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.22k £11.86k £10.37k £12.37k £17.15k
Total expenditure £12.98k £17.27k £17.65k £13.08k £8.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £13.43k