Accounts and annual returns GOSFORTH UNIT 396 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 522065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 15 March 2021 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 22 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required