LEWES MEN'S SHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide space, facilities and tools to allow local people to develop their hobbies and pursuits in a sociable and friendly environment. People may work on personal projects and are also encouraged to work on projects for the wider community. We are also provide a friendly place for a cup of tea and a chat.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 09 August 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Dale Rudwick | Chair | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Courtney Campbell | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Henry John Foster | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Caulfield | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Scotney | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Starr Taylor | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 26 March 2025 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 26 March 2025 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OLDER MEN), WITHIN LEWES AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET TO UNDERTAKE, JOINTLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; BEREAVEMENT OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite F10
Waterside Centre
North Street
LEWES
East Sussex
BN7 2PE
- Phone:
- 07710528762
- Email:
- lewesmensshed@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
lewesmensshed.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window